Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/24/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/24/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/24/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/24/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/24/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/24/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/24/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/24/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/24/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/24/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/24/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/24/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/24/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/25/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/25/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/25/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/25/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/25/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/25/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/26/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/26/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/26/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/27/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/27/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/27/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/06/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/13/2006