Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/12/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/12/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/13/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/13/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/18/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/18/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/18/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/18/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/18/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/18/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/18/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/18/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/18/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/19/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/19/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/19/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/19/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/19/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/19/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/19/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/19/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/19/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/19/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/19/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/20/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/20/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/20/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/20/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/24/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/24/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/24/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/24/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/24/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/24/2006