Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/10/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/24/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/24/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/25/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/06/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/06/2006