Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/27/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 06/27/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/27/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/27/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/27/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/27/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/27/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 09/06/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/27/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew