Refine your search

Date Major Actions
12/18/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-401.
12/18/2006 Signed by President.
12/14/2006 Presented to President.
12/09/2006 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Unanimous Consent Vote.(consideration: CR 12/8/2006 S11822-11825)
12/08/2006 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 330 - 59 (Roll no. 541).
12/07/2006 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 109-721 filed.(text of conference report: CR H8934-8950)
11/16/2006 To conference: Senate insisted on its amendment, requested a conference.
11/16/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 85 - 12. Record Vote Number: 270.(text: CR S11028-11034)
07/26/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 359 - 68 (Roll no. 411).
07/21/2006 Committee on Rules discharged.
07/21/2006 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 109-590, Part I. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
06/26/2006 Introduced in House