Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/20/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/27/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/27/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/28/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/27/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/06/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/06/2006