Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/20/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/29/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/29/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/10/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/20/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/20/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/20/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/20/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/20/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/27/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/27/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/27/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/28/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/28/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/28/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/28/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/28/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/28/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/28/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/06/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/06/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/06/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/06/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/12/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/12/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/20/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/20/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/20/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/20/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/20/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/27/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/27/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/29/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/29/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/06/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/06/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/06/2006