Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/15/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/15/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/15/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/15/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/15/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/15/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/21/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/21/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/21/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/21/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/21/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/21/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/21/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/21/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/21/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/21/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/21/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/10/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/10/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/12/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/17/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/17/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/20/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/25/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/07/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/07/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/07/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/12/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/13/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/13/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/13/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/13/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/13/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/13/2006