Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/10/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/10/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/10/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 02/10/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/15/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/16/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/12/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/03/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/23/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/12/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/12/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/22/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/15/2005