Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/13/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/13/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/17/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/12/2006