Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/08/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 06/08/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/22/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/26/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/28/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/10/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/10/2006