Refine your search

Date Major Actions
08/17/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-279.
08/17/2006 Signed by President.
08/14/2006 Presented to President.
08/02/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8667-8668)
08/01/2006 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
06/19/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 306 - 0 (Roll no. 289).(text: CR H4193)
06/07/2006 Introduced in House