Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/25/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/06/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/08/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/08/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/09/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/09/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/09/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/09/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/09/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/09/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/09/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/19/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/19/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/19/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/19/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/19/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/19/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/19/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/19/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/21/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/21/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/21/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/26/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/24/2006