Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/25/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/19/2006