Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/24/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/07/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/14/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/16/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/18/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/12/2006