Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/24/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/25/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/25/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/25/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/25/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/25/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/25/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/06/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/06/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/07/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/15/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/15/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/24/2006