Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/23/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/25/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/07/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/07/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/09/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/09/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/20/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/20/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/21/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/22/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/28/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/26/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/28/2006