Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/18/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/18/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/18/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/18/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/18/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/18/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/18/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/18/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/19/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/19/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/19/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/23/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/23/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/23/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/25/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/16/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/22/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/22/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/22/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/28/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/19/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/20/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/26/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/27/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/28/2006