Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/25/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/19/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/27/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/27/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/27/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/28/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/28/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/28/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/28/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/28/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/15/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/15/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/15/2006