Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/10/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/10/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/23/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/23/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/23/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/23/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/23/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/23/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 06/07/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/07/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/08/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/09/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/09/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/09/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/09/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/09/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/09/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/09/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/09/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/12/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/12/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/12/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/12/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/13/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/13/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/13/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/13/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/13/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/13/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/13/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/13/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/13/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/13/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/13/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/13/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/14/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/14/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/14/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/14/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/20/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/21/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/22/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/22/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/27/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/11/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/17/2006