Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/25/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/25/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/25/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/25/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/25/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/25/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/25/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/25/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/25/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/25/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/25/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/25/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/25/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/25/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/25/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/14/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/14/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/20/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/20/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/20/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/13/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/13/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/13/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/13/2006