Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/19/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/06/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/29/2006