Refine your search

Date Major Actions
09/29/2006 Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Stevens with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 109-355. Additional views filed.
06/08/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 321 - 101 (Roll no. 241).
06/06/2006 Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Energy and Commerce, H. Rept. 109-470, Part II.
05/17/2006 Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 109-470.
05/01/2006 Introduced in House