Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/12/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/29/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/29/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/29/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/29/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/18/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/14/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/14/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/14/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/14/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/19/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/19/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/19/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/20/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/20/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/26/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/29/2006