Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/02/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/16/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/16/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/16/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/16/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/18/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/18/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/09/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/09/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/09/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/09/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/09/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/09/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/12/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/12/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/14/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/14/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/21/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/21/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/29/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/24/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/24/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/24/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/24/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/06/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/13/2006