Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/27/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/02/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/02/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/02/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/04/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/11/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/11/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/11/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/11/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/17/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/19/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/24/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/24/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/07/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/07/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/13/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/15/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/16/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/16/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/28/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/18/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/18/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/28/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/28/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/21/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/29/2006