Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/09/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/09/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/09/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/09/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/09/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/09/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/16/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/16/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/16/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/16/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/24/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/07/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/07/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/07/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/26/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/26/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/26/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/26/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/26/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/27/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/10/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/10/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/24/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/28/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/08/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/08/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/08/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/08/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/14/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/14/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/27/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/13/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/13/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/08/2006