Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/27/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/27/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/27/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/02/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/02/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/04/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/09/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/09/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/10/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/10/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/10/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/10/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/11/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/24/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/24/2006