Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/06/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/25/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/16/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/16/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/16/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/18/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/18/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/18/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/18/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/18/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/22/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/24/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/24/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/06/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/06/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/06/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/12/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/12/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/12/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/13/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/13/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/13/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/16/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/16/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/19/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/20/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/21/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/21/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/21/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/22/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/10/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/28/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/06/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/07/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/12/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/14/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/19/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/14/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/05/2006