Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/27/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/27/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/16/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/16/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/21/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/21/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/21/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/21/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/21/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/21/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/21/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/21/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/21/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/21/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/21/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/21/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/21/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/21/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/21/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/21/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/21/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/21/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/21/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/21/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/21/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/21/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/21/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/21/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/21/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/21/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/29/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/06/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/07/2006