Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/05/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/05/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/05/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/05/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/06/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/06/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/27/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/23/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/07/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/20/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/20/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/20/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/20/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/07/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/14/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/20/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/20/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/29/2006