Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/25/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/10/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/2006