Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/01/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/09/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/09/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/09/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/09/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/09/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/09/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/17/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/17/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 02/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/17/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/17/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/17/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/02/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/02/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/02/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/02/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/10/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/10/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/10/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/10/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/15/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/15/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/15/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/05/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/05/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/14/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/14/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/14/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/27/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/09/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/09/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/12/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/16/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/20/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/20/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/11/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/11/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/11/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/21/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/07/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/21/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/28/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/28/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/19/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/09/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/15/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/13/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/13/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/31/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/31/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/31/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/31/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/31/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/08/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/02/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/07/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/07/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/14/2006
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/16/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/04/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/09/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/09/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/10/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/16/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/16/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/16/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/16/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/16/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/25/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/06/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/07/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/13/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/19/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/22/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/22/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/22/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/26/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/26/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/28/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/12/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/24/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/24/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/25/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/28/2006