Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/28/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/28/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/04/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/04/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/04/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/04/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/27/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/27/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/09/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/23/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/23/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/06/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/06/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/21/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/11/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/11/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/11/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/12/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/12/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/12/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/18/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/18/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/18/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/18/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/26/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/26/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/26/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/27/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/27/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/12/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/12/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/12/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/12/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/29/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/13/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/13/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/07/2006