Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/04/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/05/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/05/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/05/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/05/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/05/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/05/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/05/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/05/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/06/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 04/26/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/03/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/03/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/04/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/16/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/16/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/16/2006
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/16/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/16/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/17/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/17/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/19/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/19/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/23/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/06/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/07/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/07/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/07/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/07/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/07/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/07/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/08/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/09/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/12/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/12/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/12/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/12/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/12/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/12/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/14/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/14/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/16/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/16/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/16/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/16/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/21/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/21/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/21/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/29/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/29/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/29/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/29/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/10/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/10/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/11/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/11/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/11/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/12/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/12/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/19/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/19/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/20/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/24/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/24/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/25/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/25/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/25/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/25/2006