Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/25/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/25/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/25/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/25/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/25/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/25/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/25/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/25/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/25/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/25/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/25/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/25/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/25/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/25/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/25/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/25/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 07/26/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/26/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/27/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/27/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/28/2005