Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/25/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/01/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/04/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/04/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/08/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/08/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/08/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/08/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/08/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/11/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/11/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/18/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/25/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/25/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/25/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/06/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/06/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/06/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/19/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/19/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/22/2006