Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/13/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/04/2006