Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/14/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/28/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/20/2006