Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/26/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/24/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/07/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/08/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/08/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/08/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/17/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/19/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew