Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/07/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/08/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/08/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/08/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/08/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/08/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/09/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/14/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/14/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/15/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/15/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/30/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/19/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/19/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/19/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/19/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/19/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/20/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/20/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/20/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/20/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/21/2006