Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/28/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/02/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/07/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/09/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/29/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/29/2006