Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/28/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/09/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/14/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/14/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/10/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/10/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/18/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/19/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/16/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/16/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/16/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/16/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/16/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/16/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/16/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/16/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/11/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/28/2006