Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/08/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/08/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/15/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/30/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/16/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/25/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/19/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/20/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/20/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/25/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/29/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/29/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/29/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/13/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/13/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/15/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/15/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/15/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/06/2006