Refine your search

Date Major Actions
05/23/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 361 - 37, 9 Present (Roll no. 181).(text: CR 5/22/2006 H2990-2992)
05/15/2006 Committee on Financial Services discharged.
05/15/2006 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 109-462, Part II.
05/11/2006 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 109-462, Part I.
02/01/2006 Introduced in House