Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 12/14/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 12/14/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/14/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 12/14/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 12/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/15/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/15/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/15/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/15/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/15/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/16/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/16/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/16/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 12/16/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/16/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/16/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 12/18/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/18/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/31/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/31/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/08/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/08/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/08/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/08/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/08/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/08/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/08/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/08/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/14/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/14/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/14/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/14/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/15/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/15/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/15/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/16/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/16/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/28/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/28/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/02/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/02/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/02/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/02/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/07/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/07/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/07/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/14/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/16/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/16/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/28/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/28/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/30/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/30/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/04/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/04/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/04/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/04/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/06/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/06/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/25/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/25/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/27/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/09/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/16/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/16/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/18/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/19/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/12/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew