Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 12/08/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/07/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/07/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/07/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/06/2006