Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 12/06/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/15/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/15/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/15/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/02/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/28/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/26/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/14/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2006