Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/16/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/16/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/18/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/18/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/14/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/14/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/14/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/14/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/16/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/16/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/16/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/29/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/29/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/29/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/29/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/05/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/05/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/05/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/25/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/26/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/02/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/18/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/18/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/15/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/15/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/15/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/28/2006