Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/18/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/18/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/18/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/18/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/18/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 12/18/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/12/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/12/2006